US HB3078 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-10 - Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Secretary of Energy to carry out a program relating to physical security and cybersecurity for pipelines and liquefied natural gas facilities.
Title
Pipeline and LNG Facility Cybersecurity Preparedness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] |
Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Dingell [D-MI] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] |
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] |
Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Jeff Duncan [R-SC] | Rep. Tim Walberg [R-MI] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Morgan Griffith [R-VA] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Christopher Jacobs [R-NY] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Subcommittee on Energy Discharged. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3078/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3078/BILLS-117hr3078ih.pdf |