US HB3075 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-4)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-30 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To address seafood slavery and combat illegal, unreported, or unregulated fishing, and for other purposes.
Title
Illegal Fishing and Forced Labor Prevention Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Barry Moore [R-AL] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV] | Rep. Gregorio Sablan [D-MP] |
Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Frank Mrvan [D-IN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 493. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Energy and Commerce discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Committee on Ways and Means discharged. |
2022-12-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-674, Part I. |
2021-10-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-10-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-10-13 | House | Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Discharged. |
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-07-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture. |
2021-06-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2021-05-11 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, Transportation and Infrastructure, Agriculture, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-11 | House | Introduced in House |