US HB3074 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, And Investigations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
RESET Act Reclassification to Ensure Smarter and Equal Treatment Act of 2017 This bill amends the Controlled Substances Act to reduce the potential sentence for possession of a controlled substance by a person with one or more prior convictions. The bill repeals the provision providing for up to three years' imprisonment for the possession of a date rape drug and revises the penalties for possession of such drugs after a prior drug-related conviction. The maximum term of imprisonment for the sale or use of the mails to transport, or for importation or exportation of, drug paraphernalia is reduced to one year. The bill eliminates increased penalties for cocaine offenses where the cocaine involved is cocaine base. In determining the weight of a controlled substance or mixture of controlled substances that is in a compound with a food product, the weight of the food product shall not be included. Amendments made by this bill are applicable to both defendants who committed the offense and/or were convicted before the bill's enactment. The U.S. Sentencing Commission shall review and, if appropriate, amend the federal sentencing guidelines and policy statements applicable to any person convicted of an offense affected by this bill. There is established within the Department of Justice the Safe Neighborhoods and Schools Fund, for expenditures to: improve outcomes for public school pupils in kindergarten and grades 1 through 12 by reducing truancy and supporting students who are at risk of dropping out or are victims of crime; provide services to crime victims; support mental health treatment, substance abuse treatment, and diversion programs for people in the criminal justice system; and pay down the national debt.
Title
RESET Act Reclassification to Ensure Smarter and Equal Treatment Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations. |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-27 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Education and the Workforce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1252 (Same As) 2017-05-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Academic performance and assessments
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Budget deficits and national debt
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
U.S. Sentencing Commission
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Budget deficits and national debt
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Drug trafficking and controlled substances
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Food supply, safety, and labeling
Health programs administration and funding
Law enforcement administration and funding
Mental health
U.S. Sentencing Commission
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3074/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3074/BILLS-115hr3074ih.pdf |