US HB3068 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-1)
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-12-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 543.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of the Interior to award offshore wind career training grants to institutions of higher education or labor organizations to develop, offer, or improve educational or career training programs that provide skills necessary for employment in the offshore wind industry.
Title
Offshore Wind Jobs and Opportunity Act
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] | Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA] | Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Donald Norcross [D-NJ] |
Rep. Donald McEachin [D-VA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jeff Van Drew [R-NJ] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] | Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] |
Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA] |
Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA] | Rep. Anthony Brown [D-MD] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 543. |
2020-12-16 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2020-12-16 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 116-659, Part I. |
2020-01-15 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 20 - 13. |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2020-01-15 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2019-06-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2019-06-04 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-06-03 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1769 (Related) 2019-06-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
HB2 (Related) 2020-07-20 - Received in the Senate.
Subjects
Alternative and renewable resources
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Economic development
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
National Guard and reserves
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Youth employment and child labor
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Economic development
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Higher education
Labor and employment
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
National Guard and reserves
Nuclear power
Oil and gas
Unemployment
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Youth employment and child labor