US HB3061 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 14 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-07-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicare Prescription Drug Price Negotiation Act of 2015 Amends part D (Voluntary Prescription Drug Benefit Program) of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to negotiate with pharmaceutical manufacturers the prices that may be charged to Medicare part D prescription drug plan (PDP) sponsors and MedicareAdvantage (MA) organizations for covered part D drugs for part D eligible individuals who are enrolled under a PDP or under an MA-Prescription Drug plan.
Title
Medicare Prescription Drug Price Negotiation Act of 2015
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Louise Slaughter [D-NY] | Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN] |
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Michelle Lujan Grisham [D-NM] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL] |
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI] |
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] | Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX] | Rep. Marcy Kaptur [D-OH] |
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA] | Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA] | Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] |
Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL] |
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. James Langevin [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2015-07-14 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-07-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB31 (Same As) 2015-01-06 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3513 (Related) 2015-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2023 (Related) 2015-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3513 (Related) 2015-09-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2023 (Related) 2015-09-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Health
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
Health care costs and insurance
Inflation and prices
Medicare
Prescription drugs
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/3061/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr3061/BILLS-114hr3061ih.pdf |