US HB3045 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-31 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Military Personnel Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes Foreign Service officers on mandatory home leave eligible to use certain military lodging on the same basis as an Armed Forces member entitled to retired or retainer pay. The lodging facilities are those operated by the Department of Defense for the morale, welfare, and recreation of members.
Title
To amend section 1065 of title 10, United States Code, as added by the John S. McCain National Defense Authorization Act for Fiscal Year 2019, to extend certain morale, welfare, and recreation privileges to Foreign Service officers on mandatory home leave.
Sponsors
Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2019-05-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
2019-05-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military facilities and property
Retail and wholesale trades
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Military facilities and property
Retail and wholesale trades
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/3045/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr3045/BILLS-116hr3045ih.pdf |