US HB3045 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-24 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Eastern Legacy Extension Act This bill amends the National Trails System Act to extend the Lewis and Clark National Historic Trail to 4,900 miles, from the Ohio River in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania, to the mouth of the Columbia River in Oregon.
Title
Eastern Legacy Extension Act
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] | Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H6624) |
2018-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3045. |
2018-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H6624-6625) |
2018-07-23 | House | Mr. McClintock moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 649. |
2018-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-840. |
2018-05-16 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-05-16 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2018-05-16 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2018-04-11 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB3375 (Related) 2018-08-23 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.