US HB3043 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Health and Human Services to enter into a 10-year arrangement with the National Academy of Sciences to conduct and update biennially a study on the effects of State legalized marijuana programs, and for other purposes.
Title
Marijuana Data Collection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1456 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3043/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3043/BILLS-117hr3043ih.pdf |