US HB3033 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-124. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on February 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-124. (TXT | PDF)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
READ Act Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act (Sec. 3) This bill requires the National Science Foundation (NSF) to include in its annual congressional budget justification the amount requested for its Research in Disabilities Education program, which advances the goal of broadening the participation and achievement of learners with disabilities in science, technology, engineering, and mathematics. (Sec. 4) Subject to the availability of appropriations, NSF must devote specified funding to support research on learning disabilities, including dyslexia, with the goal of practical application.
Title
READ Act Research Excellence and Advancements for Dyslexia Act
Sponsors
Rep. Lamar Smith [R-TX] | Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] |
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Barbara Comstock [R-VA] | Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD] | Rep. Bruce Westerman [R-AR] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. David Young [R-IA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Chaka Fattah [D-PA] | Rep. Stephen Knight [R-CA] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] |
Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. John Carter [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Hultgren [R-IL] | Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT] |
Rep. Pete Sessions [R-TX] | Rep. Randy Neugebauer [R-TX] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN] |
Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Steven Palazzo [R-MS] | Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ] | Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] |
Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 114-124. (TXT | PDF) |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2016-02-04 | Senate | On motion that the House agree to the Senate amendment Agreed to without objection. (text as House agreed to Senate amendment: CR H584) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Mr. Smith (TX) asked unanimous consent that the House agree to the Senate amendment. (consideration: CR H584) |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Passed Senate with an amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.3279 Amendment SA 3279 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2016-02-03 | Senate | S.Amdt.3279 Amendment SA 3279 proposed by Senator Murkowski for Senator Lee. (consideration: CR S632; text: CR S632) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S632) |
2016-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S632) |
2015-10-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-10-26 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-10-26 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7184) |
2015-10-26 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3033. |
2015-10-26 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7184-7187) |
2015-10-26 | House | Mr. Smith (TX) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-10-08 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-10-08 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2015-07-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Disability and paralysis
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Language arts
National Science Foundation
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Education
Education programs funding
Elementary and secondary education
Executive agency funding and structure
Language arts
National Science Foundation
Research administration and funding
Science and engineering education
Teaching, teachers, curricula