US HB3020 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Immigration And Border Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Border Enforcement Accountability, Oversight, and Community Engagement Act of 2017 This bill establishes: (1) the Department of Homeland Security Border Oversight Commission, and (2) a northern border subcommittee and a southern border subcommittee within the commission. The commission and the subcommittees shall: (1) recommend border enforcement policy improvements; (2) evaluate policies of federal agencies operating along the borders to protect due process and human rights of border residents and visitors, protect land owner private property rights, and reduce the number of migrant deaths; (3) recommend safety improvements for U.S. Customs and Border Protection (CBP) personnel; and (4) evaluate training and the extent to which CBP supervisory and management personnel practices encourage workforce development and promote field safety. The Homeland Security Act of 2002 is amended to rename the position of Citizenship and Immigration Services Ombudsman in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) as the Ombudsman for Border and Immigration Related Concerns. Related function and administrative provisions are revised, including requiring the ombudsman to establish a Border Community Liaison Office in each Border Patrol sector on the northern and southern borders. The bill sets forth specified training and continuing education requirements for CBP personnel. DHS shall submit to Congress an assessment of current guidelines for managing ports of entry under DHS control. The bill requires: (1) the CBP to report to Congress regarding deaths occurring along the U.S.-Mexico border and the Government Accountability Office (GAO) to review such report; (2) the GAO to examine the extent to which the CBP has clarified use of force policies and DHS to require the CBP to implement any recommendations contained in such examination; and (3) the CBP to report to Congress on body camera use.
Title
Border Enforcement Accountability, Oversight, and Community Engagement Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] | Rep. Stevan Pearce [R-NM] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-07-12 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Border and Maritime Security. |
2017-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Trade. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative remedies
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Due process and equal protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Maine
Mexico
Michigan
Montana
Nevada
New Mexico
New York State
North Dakota
Ohio
Photography and imaging
Property rights
Texas
Vermont
Washington State
Arizona
Border security and unlawful immigration
California
Congressional oversight
Crime victims
Department of Homeland Security
Due process and equal protection
Executive agency funding and structure
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government studies and investigations
Human rights
Immigration
Immigration status and procedures
Latin America
Law enforcement administration and funding
Law enforcement officers
Maine
Mexico
Michigan
Montana
Nevada
New Mexico
New York State
North Dakota
Ohio
Photography and imaging
Property rights
Texas
Vermont
Washington State
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/3020/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr3020/BILLS-115hr3020ih.pdf |