US HB3015 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 76-2)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 18, United States Code, to prohibit a Federal firearms licensee from selling or delivering certain semiautomatic centerfire rifles to a person under 21 years of age, with exceptions for active duty military personnel and full-time law enforcement officers, and for other purposes.
Title
Raise the Age Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-05-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2021-05-07 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB7910 (Related) 2022-06-09 - Received in the Senate.
HR1153 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1153 (Similar To) 2022-06-08 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3015/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3015/BILLS-117hr3015ih.pdf |