US HB3014 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on November 19 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-11-19 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Health Information Technology Financing Act - Amends the Small Business Act to authorize the Administrator of the Small Business Administration (SBA) to guarantee up to 90% of the amount of a loan, up to specified loan amounts, to a small business health professional to be used for the acquisition and installation of health information technology for the professional's medical practice. Defines the term "health information technology" to mean computer hardware, software, and related technology that supports the meaningful electronic health record use requirements of title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act and is purchased by an eligible professional to aid in the provision of health care, including electronic medical records, but excludes information technology whose sole use is financial management, maintenance of inventory of basic supplies, or appointment scheduling. Sets loan limits at $350,000 for an individual professional and $2 million for a group of affiliated professionals. Authorizes the Administrator to impose a guarantee fee on such borrowers, but prohibits any service, processing, or other fees. Allows such loans for a period of not less than one year or more than three years. Authorizes appropriations.
Title
Small Business Health Information Technology Financing Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jason Altmire [D-PA] | Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Kathleen Dahlkemper [D-PA] | Rep. Brad Ellsworth [D-IN] |
Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Glenn Nye [D-VA] | Rep. Kurt Schrader [D-OR] | Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] |
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-11-19 | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship. | |
2009-11-18 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-11-18 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H13084-13085) | |
2009-11-18 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3014. | |
2009-11-18 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H13084-13086) | |
2009-11-18 | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-10-21 | Provisions of Measure Incorporated into H.R. 3854. | |
2009-10-08 | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee by Voice Vote . | |
2009-10-08 | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-06-24 | Referred to the Subcommittee on Finance and Tax. | |
2009-06-24 | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
Same As/Similar To
HB3854 (Related) 2009-11-02 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB2765 (Related) 2009-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
SB2765 (Related) 2009-11-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Small Business and Entrepreneurship.
Subjects
Commerce
Computers and information technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Small business
Computers and information technology
Government lending and loan guarantees
Health information and medical records
Health personnel
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medicare
Small business