US HB3010 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-17)
Status: Engrossed on September 23 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-09-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Pending: Senate Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Honoring All Veterans Act This bill adds the following as a mission statement for the Department of Veterans Affairs: "To fulfill President Lincoln's promise to care for those 'who shall have borne the battle' and for their families, caregivers, and survivors."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Honoring All Veterans Act

Sponsors

Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Thomas Suozzi [D-NY]
Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Tulsi Gabbard [D-HI]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA]Rep. Susan Wild [D-PA]
Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE]Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]
Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA]Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA]Rep. Katie Hill [D-CA]
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA]
Rep. TJ Cox [D-CA]Rep. Lauren Underwood [D-IL]Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL]Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA]
Rep. William Keating [D-MA]Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ]Rep. Anthony Brindisi [D-NY]Rep. Colin Allred [D-TX]
Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Joe Cunningham [D-SC]Rep. Elissa Slotkin [D-MI]Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL]
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Jeff Van Drew [D-NJ]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. John Ratcliffe [R-TX]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Jose Serrano [D-NY]Rep. Luis Correa [D-CA]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Andy Levin [D-MI]Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ]Rep. Max Rose [D-NY]
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA]Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]
Rep. Josh Harder [D-CA]Rep. Lee Zeldin [R-NY]Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]
Rep. John Katko [R-NY]Rep. David Roe [R-TN]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]
Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Amata Radewagen [D-AS]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]
Rep. James Hagedorn [R-MN]Rep. Al Lawson [D-FL]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ]Rep. Roger Marshall [R-KS]Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-23SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2020-09-22HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-09-22HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4677)
2020-09-22HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 3010.
2020-09-22HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4677-4678)
2020-09-22HouseMr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2020-07-30HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2020-07-30HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2020-07-23HouseCommittee Hearings Held.
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
2019-05-23HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback