US HB3000 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-2)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To build on America's spirit of service to nurture, promote, and expand a culture of service to secure the Nation's future, address critical needs of the Nation, and strengthen the civic fabric of American society.
Title
Inspire to Serve Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE] | Rep. Chrissy Houlahan [D-PA] | Rep. Michael Waltz [R-FL] |
Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] | Rep. Dean Phillips [D-MN] |
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Andy Kim [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2021-07-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight, Management, and Accountability. |
2021-05-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Foreign Affairs, Agriculture, Natural Resources, Ways and Means, Oversight and Reform, Veterans' Affairs, Homeland Security, Intelligence (Permanent Select), House Administration, the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3941 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2075 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2282 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4910 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4911 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB2075 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2282 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4910 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB4911 (Related) 2022-09-21 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/3000/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr3000/BILLS-117hr3000ih.pdf |