US HB3 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committee on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act This bill rescinds approximately $15 billion in budget authority over 2018-2028 that was proposed to be rescinded by the President under procedures included in the Impoundment Control Act of 1974. (A rescission is legislation enacted by Congress that cancels the availability of previously enacted budget authority before the authority would otherwise expire. Under current law, the President may propose rescissions to Congress, which must be enacted into law to take effect. Congress may rescind all, part, or none of the amounts proposed by the President. If Congress does not pass rescission legislation within 45 days of continuous session of Congress, the President must make the funds available.) The bill rescinds budget authority from specified programs and accounts within: the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Commerce, the Department of Energy, the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, the Department of Justice, the Department of Labor, the Department of State, the Millennium Challenge Corporation, the U.S. Agency for International Development. the Department of Transportation, the Department of the Treasury, the Environmental Protection Agency, the Corporation for National and Community Service, and the Railroad Retirement Board.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-07 - House - On Passage (Y: 210 N: 206 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committee on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
2018-06-07HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2018-06-07HouseOn passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 206 (Roll no. 243). (text: CR H4871-4872)
2018-06-07HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4957)
2018-06-07HousePOSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. DeLauro demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day.
2018-06-07HouseThe previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule.
2018-06-07HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3.
2018-06-07HouseRule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills.
2018-06-07HouseConsidered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 923. (consideration: CR H4871-4884)
2018-06-07HouseRule H. Res. 923 passed House.
2018-06-06HouseRules Committee Resolution H. Res. 923 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills.
2018-05-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
2018-05-09HouseReferred to the House Committee on Appropriations.
2018-05-09HouseIntroduced in House
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House
2017-01-03HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2979 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committees on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
HR923 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects

Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Alternative and renewable resources
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Department of Transportation
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Floods and storm protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
National and community service
Public housing
Public transit
Public utilities and utility rates
Railroads
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback