US HB3 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 17-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 11 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-20 - Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 134.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act This bill rescinds approximately $15 billion in budget authority over 2018-2028 that was proposed to be rescinded by the President under procedures included in the Impoundment Control Act of 1974. (A rescission is legislation enacted by Congress that cancels the availability of previously enacted budget authority before the authority would otherwise expire. Under current law, the President may propose rescissions to Congress, which must be enacted into law to take effect. Congress may rescind all, part, or none of the amounts proposed by the President. If Congress does not pass rescission legislation within 45 days of continuous session of Congress, the President must make the funds available.) The bill rescinds budget authority from specified programs and accounts within: the Department of Agriculture, the Department of Commerce, the Department of Energy, the Department of Health and Human Services, the Department of Housing and Urban Development, the Department of Justice, the Department of Labor, the Department of State, the Millennium Challenge Corporation, the Department of Transportation, the Department of the Treasury, the Corporation for National and Community Service, and the Railroad Retirement Board.
Title
Spending Cuts to Expired and Unnecessary Programs Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin McCarthy [R-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX] |
Rep. Mark Walker [R-NC] | Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR] | Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] |
Rep. Gary Palmer [R-AL] | Rep. David Schweikert [R-AZ] | Rep. Steve Scalise [R-LA] | Rep. Robert Aderholt [R-AL] |
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Tom McClintock [R-CA] | Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX] |
Rep. Virginia Foxx [R-NC] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - Senate - Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected RC# 134 (Y: 48 N: 50 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-07 - House - On passage RC# 243 (Y: 210 N: 206 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - House - On passage RC# 243 (Y: 210 N: 206 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-20 | House | Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget rejected by Yea-Nay Vote. 48 - 50. Record Vote Number: 134. |
2018-06-20 | House | Motion to discharge Senate Committees on Appropriations; the Budget made. (Pursuant to title X of the Congressional Budget and Impoundment Control Act of 1974). |
2018-06-11 | House | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committee on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill. |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committee on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill. |
2018-06-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-06-07 | House | On passage Passed by the Yeas and Nays: 210 - 206 (Roll no. 243). (text: CR H4871-4872) |
2018-06-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H4957) |
2018-06-07 | House | POSTPONED PROCEEDINGS - At the conclusion of debate on H.R. 3, the Chair put the question on passage of the bill and by voice vote announced that the ayes had prevailed. Ms. DeLauro demanded the yeas and nays, and the Chair postponed further proceedings until later in the legislative day. |
2018-06-07 | House | The previous question was ordered pursuant to the rule. |
2018-06-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with one hour of debate on H.R. 3. |
2018-06-07 | House | Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2018-06-07 | House | Considered under the provisions of rule H. Res. 923. (consideration: CR H4871-4884) |
2018-06-07 | House | Rule H. Res. 923 passed House. |
2018-06-06 | House | Rules Committee Resolution H. Res. 923 Reported to House. Rule provides for consideration of H.R. 5895 and H.R. 3. The resolution provides for further consideration of H.R. 5895 under a structured rule. Also, the rule provides for consideration of H.R. 3 under a closed rule with one hour of debate. The resolution provides for one motion to recommit with or without instructions for both bills. |
2018-05-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Appropriations. |
2018-05-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2979 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Read twice and referred concurrently to the Committees on Appropriations; the Budget pursuant to the order of January 30, 1975, as modified by the order of April 11, 1986, with instructions that the Budget Committee be authorized to report its views to the Appropriations Committee, and that the latter alone be authorized to report the bill.
HR923 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR923 (Related) 2018-06-07 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Advanced technology and technological innovations
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Alternative and renewable resources
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Department of Transportation
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Floods and storm protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
National and community service
Public housing
Public transit
Public utilities and utility rates
Railroads
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Agricultural conservation and pollution
Alternative and renewable resources
Appropriations
Child health
Department of Agriculture
Department of Commerce
Department of Housing and Urban Development
Department of Justice
Department of State
Department of the Treasury
Department of Transportation
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Economics and public finance
Energy efficiency and conservation
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Executive agency funding and structure
Farmland
Floods and storm protection
Foreign aid and international relief
Forests, forestry, trees
Government lending and loan guarantees
Government trust funds
Health care costs and insurance
Health care coverage and access
Health programs administration and funding
Housing and community development funding
Housing supply and affordability
Indian social and development programs
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
National and community service
Public housing
Public transit
Public utilities and utility rates
Railroads
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Solid waste and recycling
Transportation programs funding
Unemployment
Water quality
Water resources funding
Water use and supply
Watersheds
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection