US HB2997 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 20-3)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-09-06 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

21st Century AIRR Act 21st Century Aviation Innovation, Reform, and Reauthorization Act This bill reauthorizes and modifies Federal Aviation Administration (FAA) programs. It also establishes the American Air Navigation Services Corporation as a federally chartered, not-for-profit corporation to assume operational control of FAA air traffic services on October 1, 2020. The bill revises requirements for the pilot program for passenger facility charges at nonhub airports and the airport improvement program. The bill extends the authorization for airport development at Midway Island Airport. The Department of Transportation (DOT): shall carry out an environmental mitigation pilot grant program for sponsors of public-use airports; and may make grants to such sponsors for environmental mitigation projects to reduce or mitigate aviation impacts on noise, air quality, or water quality at the airport or within five miles of the airport. DOT shall establish a Safety Oversight and Certification Advisory Committee. The FAA must establish: the FAA Task Force on Flight Standards Reform, a Regulatory Consistency Communications Board, a safety workforce training strategy, and minimum dimensions for passenger seats on aircraft operated by air carriers. The FAA must also issue an order requiring the installation of a secondary cockpit barrier on aircraft manufactured for delivery to a passenger air carrier in the United States. DOT shall take appropriate actions to promote U.S. aerospace standards, products, and services abroad. DOT shall modify regulations regarding flight duty limitations and rest requirements to ensure that: (1) a flight attendant scheduled for a duty period of 14 hours or less is given a scheduled rest period of at least 10 consecutive hours, and (2) the rest period is not reduced under any circumstances. The bill prescribes certain requirements for improving passenger air service. The bill also reauthorizes the essential air service program and the small community air service development program. DOT shall: develop a comprehensive plan to accelerate the integration of civil unmanned aircraft systems (drones) into the national airspace system, establish a regional air transportation pilot program to provide operating assistance and grants to provide and maintain air service to communities not receiving sufficient air service, require each air carrier to submit for approval a one-page document that accurately describes the rights of passengers in air transportation, require large ticket agents to adopt minimum customer service standards, and establish a remote air traffic control tower pilot program for rural or small communities. Each air carrier must submit to the FAA an Employee Assault Prevention and Response Plan related to the customer service agents of the air carrier. The FAA shall review its strategic aviation cybersecurity plan.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

21st Century AIRR Act 21st Century Aviation Innovation, Reform, and Reauthorization Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-09-06HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 213.
2017-09-06HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure. H. Rept. 115-296.
2017-06-27HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 32 - 25.
2017-06-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
2017-06-22HouseReferred to the House Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure.
2017-06-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2928 (Related) 2017-06-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB2348 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB2485 (Related) 2017-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB1167 (Related) 2017-05-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB1450 (Related) 2017-06-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB4445 (Related) 2017-11-17 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB276 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
HB1386 (Related) 2017-03-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB2150 (Related) 2017-04-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB2375 (Related) 2017-05-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB2962 (Related) 2017-06-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB3007 (Related) 2017-06-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
HB3062 (Related) 2017-06-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Aviation.
SB1424 (Related) 2017-06-22 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
SB3183 (Related) 2018-07-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.

Subjects

Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
American Samoa
Aviation and airports
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Consumer affairs
Department of Transportation
Disability and paralysis
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Endangered and threatened species
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Health technology, devices, supplies
International organizations and cooperation
Labor standards
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Marketing and advertising
Marshall Islands
Micronesia
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Motor fuels
Museums, exhibitions, cultural centers
Noise pollution
Palau
Performance measurement
Presidents and presidential powers, Vice Presidents
Public contracts and procurement
Right of privacy
Roads and highways
Rural conditions and development
Science and engineering education
Solid waste and recycling
Telephone and wireless communication
Transportation and public works
Transportation employees
Transportation programs funding
Transportation safety and security
User charges and fees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Virginia
War and emergency powers
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Women's education
Women's employment
Women's health
Worker safety and health

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback