US HB2994 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Mortgage Forgiveness Tax Relief Act of 2013 - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to extend through 2014 the exclusion from gross income of income attributable to the discharge of indebtedness on a principal residence.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mortgage Forgiveness Tax Relief Act of 2013

Sponsors

Rep. Tom Reed [R-NY]Rep. Robert Andrews [D-NJ]Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL]Rep. Garland Barr [R-KY]
Rep. John Barrow [D-GA]Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA]Rep. Kerry Bentivolio [R-MI]Rep. Ami Bera [D-CA]
Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL]Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA]Rep. Timothy Bishop [D-NY]Rep. Diane Black [R-TN]
Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR]Rep. Madeleine Bordallo [D-GU]Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA]
Rep. Kevin Brady [R-TX]Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA]Rep. Susan Brooks [R-IN]Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL]
Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN]Rep. Cheri Bustos [D-IL]Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA]Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA]
Rep. Michael Capuano [D-MA]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]Rep. Andre Carson [D-IN]Rep. Matthew Cartwright [D-PA]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Howard Coble [R-NC]Rep. Mike Coffman [R-CO]
Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK]Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. John Conyers [D-MI]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]
Rep. Ander Crenshaw [R-FL]Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Susan Davis [D-CA]
Rep. Theodore Deutch [D-FL]Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI]Rep. Donna Edwards [D-MD]Rep. Keith Ellison [D-MN]Rep. William Enyart [D-IL]
Rep. Elizabeth Esty [D-CT]Rep. Sam Farr [D-CA]Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. John Fleming [R-LA]
Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA]Rep. Bill Foster [D-IL]Rep. Rodney Frelinghuysen [R-NJ]Rep. Pete Gallego [D-TX]
Rep. Joe Garcia [D-FL]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Rep. Jim Gerlach [R-PA]Rep. Bob Gibbs [R-OH]
Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY]Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA]Rep. Kay Granger [R-TX]Rep. Alan Grayson [D-FL]
Rep. Tim Griffin [R-AR]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY]Rep. Luis Gutierrez [D-IL]
Rep. Richard Hanna [R-NY]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA]Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY]
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX]Rep. Richard Hudson [R-NC]Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA]Rep. Bill Huizenga [R-MI]
Rep. Hakeem Jeffries [D-NY]Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS]Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH]Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]
Rep. David Jolly [R-FL]Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. William Keating [D-MA]
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI]Rep. Peter King [R-NY]Rep. Ann Kirkpatrick [D-AZ]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Leonard Lance [R-NJ]Rep. John Larson [D-CT]Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. John Lewis [D-GA]Rep. Daniel Lipinski [D-IL]Rep. Frank LoBiondo [R-NJ]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]
Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Kenny Marchant [R-TX]
Rep. Tom Marino [R-PA]Rep. Doris Matsui [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn McCarthy [D-NY]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]
Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Mark Meadows [R-NC]Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]
Rep. Luke Messer [R-IN]Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME]Rep. Gary Miller [R-CA]Rep. George Miller [D-CA]
Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. James Moran [D-VA]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]
Rep. Richard Neal [D-MA]Rep. Gloria Negrete McLeod [D-CA]Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN]Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]
Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL]Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. Erik Paulsen [R-MN]
Rep. Ed Perlmutter [D-CO]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Rep. Thomas Petri [R-WI]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]
Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI]Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL]Rep. David Price [D-NC]Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL]
Rep. Trey Radel [R-FL]Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY]Rep. James Renacci [R-OH]Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI]
Rep. Tom Rice [R-SC]Rep. Todd Rokita [R-IN]Rep. Thomas Rooney [R-FL]Rep. Peter Roskam [R-IL]
Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. Jon Runyan [R-NJ]Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD]
Rep. Linda Sanchez [D-CA]Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Bradley Schneider [D-IL]
Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL]Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA]Rep. Brad Sherman [D-CA]Rep. Bill Shuster [R-PA]
Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Rep. Christopher Smith [R-NJ]Rep. Jason Smith [R-MO]Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH]
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA]Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA]Rep. Patrick Tiberi [R-OH]
Rep. John Tierney [D-MA]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA]
Rep. Michael Turner [R-OH]Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI]Rep. Marc Veasey [D-TX]Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]
Rep. Peter Visclosky [D-IN]Rep. Melvin Watt [D-NC]Rep. Daniel Webster [R-FL]Rep. Roger Williams [R-TX]
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Joe Wilson [R-SC]Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA]Rep. Steve Womack [R-AR]
Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]

History

DateChamberAction
2013-08-02HouseReferred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Same As/Similar To

HB2788 (Related) 2013-07-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1187 (Related) 2013-06-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB3856 (Related) 2014-01-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB5785 (Related) 2014-12-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback