US HB2989 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 26 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-10-26 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requires federal financial regulatory agencies to adopt specified data standards with respect to format, searchability, and transparency. The bill also decreases, beginning September 30, 2031, the cap on the surplus funds of the Federal Reserve banks. (Amounts exceeding this cap are deposited in the general fund of the Treasury.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial Transparency Act of 2021

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-10-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 400 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-10-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2021-10-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2021-10-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 400 - 19 (Roll no. 333). (text: CR H5840-5846)
2021-10-25HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H5854-5855)
2021-10-25HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2021-10-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2989.
2021-10-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5840-5848)
2021-10-25HouseMs. Waters moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2021-06-21HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Commodity Exchanges, Energy, and Credit.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-04HouseReferred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2021-05-04HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback