US HB2969 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-07-23 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an Independent Financial Technology Working Group to Combat Terrorism and Illicit Financing, and for other purposes.
Title
Financial Technology Protection Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Zachary Nunn [R-IA] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] |
Rep. William Timmons [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-23 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2024-07-22 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2024-07-22 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H4651-4652) |
2024-07-22 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2969. |
2024-07-22 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H4651-4653) |
2024-07-22 | House | Mr. Nunn (IA) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2024-05-06 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 402. |
2024-05-06 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-485. |
2023-07-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 50 - 0. |
2023-07-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held |
2023-04-27 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-04-27 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1340 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.