US HB2954 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 30 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-30 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To increase retirement savings, simplify and clarify retirement plan rules, and for other purposes.
Title
Securing a Strong Retirement Act of 2022
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended (Y: 414 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-29 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 414 - 5 (Roll no. 86). (text: CR H3925-3939) |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H3951-3952) |
2022-03-29 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2022-03-29 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with eighty minutes of debate on H.R. 2954. |
2022-03-29 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3925-3950) |
2022-03-29 | House | UNANIMOUS CONSENT - Mr. Neal asked unanimous consent that debate under clause 1(c) of rule 15 on a motion to suspend the rules and pass H.R. 2954, as amended be extended to eighty minutes of debate. Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-29 | House | Mr. Neal moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2022-03-29 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 210. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee on Education and Labor discharged. |
2022-03-29 | House | Committee on Financial Services discharged. |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 117-283, Part I. |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, and Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-05-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1453 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1443 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S2357-2358; Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2357)
HB2741 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2917 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2933 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2943 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2944 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1703 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2909 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2927 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2942 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2951 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2953 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1730 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8579 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB5125 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1443 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S2357-2358; Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S2357)
HB2741 (Related) 2021-04-21 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2917 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2933 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2943 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2944 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1703 (Related) 2021-05-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB2909 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2927 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committee on Education and Labor, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB2942 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2951 (Related) 2021-04-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB2953 (Related) 2021-05-04 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB1730 (Related) 2021-05-20 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
HB8579 (Related) 2022-07-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB5125 (Related) 2022-11-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.