US HB2951 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-24 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for Medicare coverage of dental and oral health services, including routine diagnostic and preventive services, basic and major dental services, and emergency care; dental prostheses are also covered. Currently, such services are excluded from Medicare coverage.
Title
Medicare Dental Benefit Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB22 (Same As) 2019-01-03 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1423 (Related) 2019-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1423 (Related) 2019-05-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Dental care
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
Emergency medical services and trauma care
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Health technology, devices, supplies
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Medicare
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2951/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2951/BILLS-116hr2951ih.pdf |