US HB295 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Committee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

End Banking for Human Traffickers Act of 2019 This bill establishes requirements related to the use of financial transactions in human trafficking. The bill adds the Secretary of the Treasury as a member of the President's Interagency Task Force to Monitor and Combat Trafficking. The task force must submit to Congress recommendations for the revision of anti-money laundering programs specifically targeting severe forms of human trafficking. The Federal Financial Institutions Examination Council must review procedures to improve the capability of specified programs to target financial transactions relating to severe forms of human trafficking. The Office of Terrorism and Financial Intelligence must coordinate with other specified agencies to combat the illicit financing relating to severe forms of human trafficking. The bill provides additional criteria to be considered by the State Department to indicate a country's serious and sustained efforts to eliminate human trafficking. Specifically, the bill adds criteria regarding whether a country has taken or is taking steps to implement a framework for preventing financial transactions involving severe forms of human trafficking.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

End Banking for Human Traffickers Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Agreed to Seek Consideration Under Suspension of the Rules,.
2019-03-07HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-03-07HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB667 (Related) 2019-03-05 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92.
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback