US HB2945 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-06-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides for the continuation of certain military land withdrawals and makes changes to the administration of natural resources on military installations. The bill removes the U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service as the acting agency that provides for the conservation and rehabilitation of natural resources on military installations, except in the case of a military installation or state-owned National Guard installation in Alaska. Each integrated natural resources management plan for a military installation or state-owned National Guard installation outside Alaska must be reviewed (1) jointly by the military department concerned and the Department of the Interior, and (2) in a manner that provides affected states and Indian tribes and the public an opportunity to comment on any significant revisions to the plan that may be proposed. The bill eliminates the withdrawal termination date for lands including (1) the El Centro Naval Air Facility in California, (2) the Juniper Butte military range in Idaho, (3) the Barry M. Goldwater military range in Arizona, and (4) the Fort Irwin military land withdrawal in California. The land withdrawals for the Fort Greely and Fort Wainwright military training ranges in Alaska shall be terminated on November 6, 2026.
Title
Engle Act
Sponsors
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee for Indigenous Peoples of the United States. |
2019-05-24 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Alaska
California
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Idaho
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Alaska
California
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Geography and mapping
Government information and archives
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Idaho
Intergovernmental relations
Land transfers
Land use and conservation
Military facilities and property
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2945/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2945/BILLS-116hr2945ih.pdf |