US HB2943 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 24 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-07-24 - Received in the Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Department of Veterans Affairs (VA) to make all of its fact sheets available in English, Spanish, and Tagalog. The bill also requires the VA to establish a publicly available website that provides links to all VA fact sheets. Finally, the VA must report to Congress regarding the utilization of such fact sheets as well as the details of the Language Access Plan of the VA.
Title
Providing Benefits Information in Spanish and Tagalog for Veterans and Families Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] |
Rep. Veronica Escobar [D-TX] | Rep. Ruben Gallego [D-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-24 | Senate | Received in the Senate. |
2019-07-23 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-07-23 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H7204-7205) |
2019-07-23 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2943. |
2019-07-23 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7204-7206) |
2019-07-23 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-07-18 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 118. |
2019-07-18 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 116-158. |
2019-06-20 | House | Committee Hearings Held. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-05-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Department of Veterans Affairs
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives
Department of Veterans Affairs
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Government information and archives