US HB2941 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Engrossed on November 1 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-11-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Pending: Senate Agriculture, Nutrition, And Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Kisatchie National Forest Land Conveyance Act (Sec. 4) The bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to sell specified federal land in the Kisatchie National Forest in Winn Parish, Louisiana, for fair market value. USDA shall convey a portion of that land to Collins Camp Properties, Inc. USDA may configure the federal land to be conveyed so as to maximize the marketability of the conveyance or to achieve management objectives. Consideration for a conveyance of federal land under this bill shall be in cash. In any conveyance of federal land under this bill, USDA shall meet disclosure requirements for hazardous substances but shall not otherwise be required to remediate or abate such substances. (Sec. 5) USDA shall deposit the proceeds from such conveyances in the fund established under the Sisk Act. (Sec. 6) USDA shall require Collins Camp Properties to pay at closing reasonable appraisal costs and the cost of any administrative and environmental analyses required by law. An offer by Collins Camp Properties for acquiring the federal land must be accompanied by a written statement from each holder of a Forest Service special use authorization with respect to such land specifying that the holder agrees to relinquish that authorization upon the conveyance of such land to Collins Camp Properties. If a holder fails to furnish such a written statement, USDA shall require Collins Camp Properties to administer that authorization in accordance with its terms until it expires.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Kisatchie National Forest Land Conveyance Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-11-01SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
2017-10-31HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2017-10-31HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8282)
2017-10-31HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2941.
2017-10-31HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8282-8283)
2017-10-31HouseMr. Crawford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2017-10-19HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 257.
2017-10-19HouseReported by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 115-353.
2017-10-04HouseOrdered to be Reported by Voice Vote.
2017-10-04HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2017-07-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
2017-06-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
2017-06-20HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB2031 (Same As) 2017-10-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback