US HB2940 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 18-7)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 236.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-10-23 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 236.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Educator Tax Relief Act of 2015 (Sec. 2) This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code, with respect to the tax deduction for the expenses of elementary and secondary school teachers, to: (1) allow an inflation adjustment to the amount of such deduction for taxable years beginning after 2014, (2) allow the deduction of professional development expenses, and (3) make such deduction permanent. The bill applies to taxable years beginning after 2014.
Title
Educator Tax Relief Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. David Reichert [R-WA] | Rep. Jim McDermott [D-WA] | Rep. Robert Dold [R-IL] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] |
Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL] | Rep. David Valadao [R-CA] | Rep. Jeff Denham [R-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
Rep. Dan Benishek [R-MI] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] |
Rep. Bruce Poliquin [R-ME] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] | Rep. Michael Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] |
Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] | Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ] | Rep. Tim Murphy [R-PA] |
Rep. Ryan Costello [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. Lynn Jenkins [R-KS] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] |
Rep. Richard Nugent [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-23 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 236. |
2015-10-23 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Ways and Means. H. Rept. 114-310. |
2015-09-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 23 - 13. |
2015-09-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2029 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Became Public Law No: 114-113. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Elementary and secondary education
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Higher education
Income tax deductions
Inflation and prices
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula