US HB2937 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-09 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, And The Internet Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To permit Amtrak to bring civil actions in Federal district court to enforce the right set forth in section 24308(c) of title 49, United States Code, which gives intercity and commuter rail passenger transportation preference over freight transportation in using a rail line, junction, or crossing.
Title
Rail Passenger Fairness Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-09 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Courts, Intellectual Property, and the Internet. |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, and in addition to the Committee on the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1500 (Same As) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text: CR S2363-2364)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2937/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2937/BILLS-117hr2937ih.pdf |