US HB2932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Homeland Security for Children Act This bill requires the Office of Strategy, Policy, and Plans in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to review and incorporate into DHS policy feedback from organizations representing the needs of children. The bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to identify and integrate the needs of children into activities to prepare for, protect against, respond to, recover from, and mitigate against the risk of natural disasters, acts of terrorism, and other man-made disasters, including by appointing a technical expert to coordinate such integration.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homeland Security for Children Act

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 55 (Y: 374 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
2020-02-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2020-02-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 11 (Roll no. 55). (text: CR H990)
2020-02-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H999-1000)
2020-02-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2020-02-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2932.
2020-02-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H990-991)
2020-02-10HouseMs. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2020-01-08HousePlaced on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 294.
2020-01-08HouseCommittee on Transportation discharged.
2020-01-08HouseReported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-370, Part I.
2019-10-23HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-10-23HouseSubcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Discharged.
2019-10-23HouseOrdered to be Reported.
2019-06-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery.
2019-05-23HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback