US HB2932 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
Pending: Senate Homeland Security And Governmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the Office of Strategy, Policy, and Plans in the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to review and incorporate into DHS policy feedback from organizations representing the needs of children. The bill directs the Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA) to identify and integrate the needs of children into activities to prepare for, protect against, respond to, recover from, and mitigate against the risk of natural disasters, acts of terrorism, and other man-made disasters, including by appointing a technical expert to coordinate such integration.
Title
Homeland Security for Children Act
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Peter King [R-NY] | Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 55 (Y: 374 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 44) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs. |
2020-02-10 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2020-02-10 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 374 - 11 (Roll no. 55). (text: CR H990) |
2020-02-10 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H999-1000) |
2020-02-10 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2020-02-10 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2932. |
2020-02-10 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H990-991) |
2020-02-10 | House | Ms. Torres Small (NM) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2020-01-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 294. |
2020-01-08 | House | Committee on Transportation discharged. |
2020-01-08 | House | Reported by the Committee on Homeland Security. H. Rept. 116-370, Part I. |
2019-10-23 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-10-23 | House | Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery Discharged. |
2019-10-23 | House | Ordered to be Reported. |
2019-06-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Emergency Preparedness, Response, and Recovery. |
2019-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Homeland Security, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-05-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB8791 (Related) 2020-11-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism
Child health
Child safety and welfare
Congressional oversight
Department of Homeland Security
Disaster relief and insurance
Emergency management
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal Emergency Management Agency (FEMA)
Natural disasters
Terrorism