US HB2931 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on July 20 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-20 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for certain programs and developments in the Department of Energy concerning the cybersecurity and vulnerabilities of, and physical threats to, the electric grid, and for other purposes.
Title
Enhancing Grid Security through Public-Private Partnerships Act
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Rep. Larry Bucshon [R-IN] | Rep. Debbie Lesko [R-AZ] |
Rep. Fred Keller [R-PA] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] |
Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Abigail Spanberger [D-VA] | Rep. Warren Davidson [R-OH] |
Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2021-07-19 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-07-19 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3639-3640) |
2021-07-19 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2931. |
2021-07-19 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3639-3641) |
2021-07-19 | House | Mr. Pallone moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-07-19 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 67. |
2021-07-19 | House | Reported by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 117-93. |
2021-06-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-06-09 | House | Subcommittee on Energy Discharged. |
2021-05-03 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |