US HB293 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To prevent and reduce the use of tobacco products, and for other purposes.
Title
Youth Vaping Prevention Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-25 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, and Energy and Commerce, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-01-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2517 (Related) 2019-09-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text: CR S5605-5606)
Subjects
Child health
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Inflation and prices
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Drug, alcohol, tobacco use
Health
Inflation and prices
Sales and excise taxes
State and local taxation
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/293/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr293/BILLS-116hr293ih.pdf |