US HB2923 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 9-4)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Maritime and Energy Workforce Technical Training Enhancement Act This bill directs the Department of Energy (DOE) to award grants to enable eligible community colleges and other public institutions of higher education to expand upon existing programs in maritime and energy workforce technical training, including by admitting more students, training faculty, expanding facilities, creating new maritime career pathways from associate degree to baccalaureate degree programs, and awarding credit for prior learning experience, or increasing cooperation with specified federal departments or the National Science Foundation. DOE shall give priority to institutions that have entered into a partnership with one of such departments. DOE may also award a grant to a nonprofit organization with a track record of at least 10 years of expertise in working with community colleges on developing workforce development programs, to provide assistance in carrying out this Act. Recipients shall use grant amounts for: training related to maritime or energy transportation, logistics, and supply chain management or to shipbuilding and ship repair; enhancement of academic and workforce training programs for maritime and energy employment; salary supplementation for faculty in maritime or energy training and education; operation and maintenance of maritime or energy related equipment and technology for use in instructional programs; acquisition of marine vessels and other assets and equipment for use in maritime or energy related training and education; renovation or construction of buildings to house maritime or energy training and education programs; and tuition reimbursement for successful completion of a maritime or energy course, program, or certification.
Title
Maritime and Energy Workforce Technical Training Enhancement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gene Green [D-TX] | Rep. Brian Babin [R-TX] | Rep. Robert Scott [D-VA] | Rep. Reid Ribble [R-WI] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] | Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] |
Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Carlos Curbelo [R-FL] | Rep. Ted Poe [R-TX] |
Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-06-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Coast Guard and Maritime Transportation. |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-06-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committee on Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2053 (Related) 2015-09-17 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Subjects
Education programs funding
Employment and training programs
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Labor and employment
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
Employment and training programs
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Higher education
Labor and employment
Marine and inland water transportation
Navigation, waterways, harbors
Transportation employees
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Vocational and technical education
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2923/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2923/BILLS-114hr2923ih.pdf |