US HB2913 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-16)
Status: Introduced on May 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Eastern Mediterranean Security and Energy Partnership Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Eastern Mediterranean Security and Energy Partnership Act of 2019

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-05-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2512 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Referred to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Financial Services, Oversight and Reform, Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
SB922 (Related) 2019-03-28 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations.
SB1102 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 142.
HB4558 (Related) 2019-09-27 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.

Subjects

Alliances
Alternative and renewable resources
Asia
Banking and financial institutions regulation
Business investment and capital
Central Europe
Collective security
Conflicts and wars
Congressional oversight
Crime prevention
Cultural exchanges and relations
Cyprus
Defense spending
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Energy research
Energy storage, supplies, demand
Europe
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign and international banking
Foreign language and bilingual programs
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Greece
Intellectual property
Intelligence activities, surveillance, classified information
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Israel
Middle East
Military assistance, sales, and agreements
Military education and training
Military facilities and property
Military operations and strategy
Military procurement, research, weapons development
News media and reporting
Oil and gas
Pipelines
Public-private cooperation
Religion
Russia
Sanctions
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Subversive activities
Syria
Terrorism
Trade restrictions
Turkey
U.S. and foreign investments
Ukraine

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback