US HB2911 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-22 - Became Public Law No: 117-63.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a plan for obligating and expending Coronavirus pandemic funding made available to the Department of Veterans Affairs, and for other purposes.
Title
VA Transparency & Trust Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Christopher Pappas [D-NH] | Rep. Tracey Mann [R-KS] |
Rep. Antonio Delgado [D-NY] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] | Rep. Jason Crow [D-CO] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-17 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill (Y: 411 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-22 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-63. |
2021-11-22 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-15 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-10-28 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-10-28 | House | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7450) |
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-17 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-17 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 411 - 4 (Roll no. 144). (text: CR H2363) |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2403-2404) |
2021-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2911. |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2363-2364) |
2021-05-17 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 22 - 6. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-04-30 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-04-30 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1446 (Related) 2021-04-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.