US HB2899 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating areas within the island of Guam as a National Heritage Area, and for other purposes.
Title
To direct the Secretary of the Interior to conduct a study to assess the suitability and feasibility of designating areas within the island of Guam as a National Heritage Area, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael San Nicolas [D-GU] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2022-03-15 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2022-03-15 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3725) |
2022-03-15 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2899. |
2022-03-15 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3725-3726) |
2022-03-15 | House | Mr. Grijalva moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2022-03-09 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 194. |
2022-03-09 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-265. |
2021-07-14 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-07-14 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-07-14 | House | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Discharged. |
2021-06-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-28 | House | Introduced in House |