US HB2897 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 17 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-08-01 - By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-315.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To authorize the Mayor of the District of Columbia and the Director of the National Park Service to enter into cooperative management agreements for the operation, maintenance, and management of units of the National Park System in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes. (Sec. 1) This bill authorizes the District of Columbia and the National Park Service (NPS) to enter into cooperative management agreements for the operation, maintenance, and management of National Park System units in DC, including the design and construction of improvements. Such agreements may include terms and conditions relating to the allocation of responsibility between DC and the NPS and the payment of funds by the NPS and DC in support of such agreement.
Title
To authorize the Mayor of the District of Columbia and the Director of the National Park Service to enter into cooperative management agreements for the operation, maintenance, and management of units of the National Park System in the District of Columbia, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-08-01 | Senate | By Senator Murkowski from Committee on Energy and Natural Resources filed written report. Report No. 115-315. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 542. |
2018-07-30 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Reported by Senator Murkowski with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and an amendment to the title. Without written report. |
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2018-02-14 | Senate | Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held. |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-01-16 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H394) |
2018-01-16 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2897. |
2018-01-16 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H394-395) |
2018-01-16 | House | Mr. Gianforte moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. |
2017-12-05 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 323. |
2017-12-05 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-436, Part II. |
2017-12-04 | House | Reported by the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform. H. Rept. 115-436, Part I. |
2017-10-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-10-04 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-10-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-07-19 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-07-19 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-06-22 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-06-13 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E814-815) |
2017-06-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1956 (Same As) 2018-02-14 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
District of Columbia
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations
Intergovernmental relations
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
State and local government operations