US HB2861 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Introduced on June 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-11-16 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Veteran Employment Transition Act Amends the Internal Revenue Code to: (1) revise the definition of "qualified veteran" for purposes of the work opportunity tax credit to include recently discharged veterans, and (2) make permanent the work opportunity tax credit for qualified veterans. Requires the Department of Defense (DOD) and the National Guard to inform military personnel who are discharged or released from active duty of the work opportunity tax credit and provide them with documentation relating to eligibility for and use of such credit. Requires DOD and the Departments of Labor and Veterans Affairs to enter into an agreement to govern the coordination of veteran job training services. Requires the Departments of Labor and Veterans Affairs to prepare reports on the veteran job training programs of their respective departments. Amends the DOD pilot program for assessing the feasibility and advisability of permitting enlisted personnel to obtain civilian credentialing or licensing for skills required for military occupational specialties to require the designation as military occupational specialties of the MOS 31B Military Police, MOS 15Q AC-Air Traffic Controller, and the MOS 12M Fire Protection, in addition to not fewer than three and not more than five additional military occupational specialties. Amends the Small Business Act to direct the head of each executive department to submit an annual report to the Small Business Administration containing the percentage of the total value of all prime contracts awarded by the executive department during the preceding one-year period to small business concerns owned and controlled by service-disabled veterans.
Title
Veteran Employment Transition Act
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA] | Rep. Brad Ashford [D-NE] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Mark Takano [D-CA] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Janice Hahn [D-CA] | Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Karen Bass [D-CA] |
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Niki Tsongas [D-MA] | Rep. Nita Lowey [D-NY] |
Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA] | Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training. |
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Military Personnel. |
2015-07-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Veterans' Affairs |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Education and the Workforce |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Small Business |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Armed Services |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2015-06-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Armed Services, Small Business, Education and the Workforce, and Veterans' Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2015-06-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Congressional oversight
Disability and paralysis
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
Disability and paralysis
Employment and training programs
Government information and archives
Income tax credits
Performance measurement
Personnel records
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Veterans' education, employment, rehabilitation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/2861/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr2861/BILLS-114hr2861ih.pdf |