US HB2852 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 11 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-09-11 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019 This bill modifies requirements for appraisers of Federal Housing Administration-insured mortgages. Currently, an appraiser must be certified by certain state or national entities. The bill removes the national entities from the list of approved certification entities and allows an appraiser to be state-licensed rather than state-certified to meet requirements. The bill also provides specified educational requirements for appraisers.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Homebuyer Assistance Act of 2019

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-09-10 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended RC# 519 (Y: 419 N: 5 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-09-11SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
2019-09-10HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-09-10HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 419 - 5 (Roll no. 519). (text: CR H7572)
2019-09-10HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H7585-7586)
2019-09-10HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-09-10HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2852.
2019-09-10HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H7572-7573)
2019-09-10HouseMr. San Nicolas moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
2019-07-11HouseOrdered to be Reported Without Recommendation (Amended) by Voice Vote.
2019-07-11HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
2019-05-20HouseReferred to the House Committee on Financial Services.
2019-05-20HouseIntroduced in House

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback