US HB2849 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-08 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Louisiana Flood and Storm Devastation Tax Relief Act of 2017 This bill amends the Internal Revenue Code to modify several tax provisions and rules for individuals and businesses affected by storms and flooding in Louisiana. The bill applies to the area with respect to which a major disaster has been declared by the President under the Robert T. Stafford Disaster Relief and Emergency Assistance Act: before September 3, 2016, by reason of severe storms and flooding occurring in Louisiana during August 2016; before April 21, 2016, by reason of severe storms and flooding occurring in Louisiana during March and April 2016; and before February 12, 2017, by reason of tornadoes, storms, and straight-line winds occurring in Louisiana on February 7, 2017. For individuals and businesses in the specified Louisiana storm and flood disaster area, the bill modifies tax provisions and rules regarding: (1) early withdrawals of retirement funds; (2) employment-related tax credits; (3) charitable contributions; and (4) various tax deductions, exclusions, and credits related to losses and recovery from the storms and flooding.
Title
Louisiana Flood and Storm Devastation Tax Relief Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Garret Graves [R-LA] | Rep. Cedric Richmond [D-LA] | Rep. Ralph Abraham [R-LA] | Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2017-06-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Atmospheric science and weather
Books and print media
Capital gains tax
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Income tax exclusion
Louisiana
Low- and moderate-income housing
Motor vehicles
Poverty and welfare assistance
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Transportation costs
Wages and earnings
Books and print media
Capital gains tax
Charitable contributions
Disaster relief and insurance
Economic development
Elementary and secondary education
Employee benefits and pensions
Floods and storm protection
Forests, forestry, trees
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Housing finance and home ownership
Income tax credits
Income tax deductions
Income tax deferral
Income tax exclusion
Louisiana
Low- and moderate-income housing
Motor vehicles
Poverty and welfare assistance
Residential rehabilitation and home repair
Securities
Small business
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Tax administration and collection, taxpayers
Taxation
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Transportation costs
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2849/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2849/BILLS-115hr2849ih.pdf |