US HB2848 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-07-29 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To A bill to amend the Marine Mammal Protection Act of 1972 to reauthorize and modify the John H. Prescott Marine Mammal Rescue Assistance Grant Program, and for other purposes.
Title
Marine Mammal Research and Response Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Stephanie Murphy [D-FL] | Rep. Brian Mast [R-FL] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. Val Demings [D-FL] | Rep. John Rutherford [R-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] |
Rep. Joseph Neguse [D-CO] | Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] |
Rep. Lois Frankel [D-FL] | Rep. Byron Donalds [R-FL] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-29 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-06-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife. |
2021-04-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2021-04-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1289 (Same As) 2022-02-15 - By Senator Cantwell from Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation filed written report. Report No. 117-77.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2848/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2848/BILLS-117hr2848ih.pdf |