US HB283 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

To adjust the boundaries of the Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park, and for other purposes. This bill redesignates the Ocmulgee National Monument in Georgia as the Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park. The boundary of the park is adjusted to include approximately 2,100 acres of land. The Department of the Interior may acquire lands and interests within the boundaries of the park by donation, purchase, or exchange, but not by condemnation. Interior shall administer any acquired land as part of the park. Interior shall conduct a special resource study of the Ocmulgee River corridor between the cities of Macon, Georgia, and Hawkinsville, Georgia, to evaluate the national significance of the study area and determine the suitability and feasibility of designating the study area as a unit of the National Park System.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

To adjust the boundaries of the Ocmulgee Mounds National Historical Park, and for other purposes.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-05HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB88 (Related) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback