US HB2820 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 25 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide financial assistance to schools impacted by radioactive contaminants, and for other purposes.
Title
Justice for Jana Elementary Act of 2023
Sponsors
Rep. Cori Bush [D-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment, Manufacturing, and Critical Materials. |
2023-04-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2023-04-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on Education and the Workforce, and in addition to the Committees on Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2023-04-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB418 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-bill/2820/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hr2820/BILLS-118hr2820ih.pdf |