US HB2810 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-9)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Treats certain payments made by Indian tribal governments to children as earned income of the child for the purposes of the kiddie tax (the tax on the unearned income of children). This has the effect of exempting the payments from the tax. The bill applies to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017.
Title
Tax Fairness for Tribal Youth Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] | Rep. Ron Estes [R-KS] | Rep. Ken Calvert [R-CA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] |
Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] | Rep. Tom Cole [R-OK] | Rep. Paul Cook [R-CA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM] | Rep. Ron Kind [D-WI] | Rep. Raul Ruiz [D-CA] | Rep. Donna Shalala [D-FL] |
Rep. Don Young [R-AK] | Rep. Daniel Kildee [D-MI] | Rep. Gil Cisneros [D-CA] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] |
Rep. Charlie Crist [D-FL] | Rep. Sharice Davids [D-KS] | Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Greg Steube [R-FL] |
Rep. Darren Soto [D-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB4728 (Related) 2019-10-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
SB2079 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB2079 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2810/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2810/BILLS-116hr2810ih.pdf |