US HB2801 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-9)
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-07-26 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting Access to Rural Therapy Services (PARTS) Act - Amends title XVIII (Medicare) of the Social Security Act to state that, except with respect to high-risk or complex medical services requiring direct levels of supervision, if the Secretary of Health and Human Services (HHS) requires supervision by a physician or non-physician practitioner for Medicare payment for therapeutic hospital outpatient services, that requirement is met if such services are furnished under the physician's or non-physician practitioner's general supervision. Directs the Secretary of HHS to establish a process for designating therapeutic hospital outpatient services for which direct supervision may be required for the entire service or direct supervision during the initiation of the service followed by general supervision for the remainder of the service. Declares without force or effect in law regarding Medicare requirements for direct supervision by physicians for therapeutic hospital outpatient services a specified restatement and clarification under the final rulemaking changes to the Medicare hospital outpatient prospective payment system and calendar year 2009 payment rates, which was published in the Federal Register on November 18, 2008.
Title
Protecting Access to Rural Therapy Services (PARTS) Act
Sponsors
Rep. Kristi Noem [R-SD] | Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Rep. Sean Duffy [R-WI] |
Rep. Blake Farenthold [R-TX] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] | Rep. Christopher Gibson [R-NY] | Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA] |
Rep. Tim Huelskamp [R-KS] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA] | Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. Richard Nolan [D-MN] |
Rep. William Owens [D-NY] | Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] | Rep. Mike Pompeo [R-KS] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Timothy Walz [D-MN] | Rep. Don Young [R-AK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-26 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Ways and Means |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2013-07-23 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1143 (Same As) 2013-06-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
Advisory bodies
Cardiovascular and respiratory health
Department of Health and Human Services
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health personnel
Home and outpatient care
Medicare
Rural conditions and development
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/house-bill/2801/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/hr2801/BILLS-113hr2801ih.pdf |