US HB2792 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 31 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-05-31 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.
Pending: Senate Banking, Housing, And Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
To require the Securities and Exchange Commission to carry out a study and rulemaking on the definition of the term "small entity" for purposes of the securities laws, and for other purposes.
Title
Small Entity Update Act
Sponsors
Rep. Ann Wagner [R-MO] | Rep. James Himes [D-CT] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Ritchie Torres [D-NY] |
Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-30 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 238 (Y: 367 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 60) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-31 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs. |
2023-05-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-05-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 367 - 8 (Roll no. 238). |
2023-05-30 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-05-30 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-05-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2792. |
2023-05-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-05-30 | House | Mrs. Wagner moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-05-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 59. |
2023-05-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 118-80. |
2023-04-26 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 42 - 0. |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-04-20 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2023-04-20 | House | Introduced in House |