US HB2789 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 22 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-07-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to administer a pilot program to employ veterans in positions that relate to conservation and resource management activities.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to administer a pilot program to employ veterans in positions that relate to conservation and resource management activities.
Sponsors
Rep. Conor Lamb [D-PA] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Marilyn Strickland [D-WA] |
Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. David Joyce [R-OH] | Rep. Rebecca Sherrill [D-NJ] | Rep. James Baird [R-IN] |
Rep. Elaine Luria [D-VA] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Ed Case [D-HI] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] |
Rep. Kaialii Kahele [D-HI] | Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Opportunity. |
2021-06-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands. |
2021-04-22 | House | Referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs, and in addition to the Committees on Agriculture, Natural Resources, and Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-04-22 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/2789/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr2789/BILLS-117hr2789ih.pdf |