US HB2781 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-4)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-10-29 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Reauthorizes through FY2024 certain Health Resources & Services Administration (HRSA) training and education grants programs for health care professionals, including, among others, funding to increase the number of health care professionals from underrepresented groups.The bill also revises and reauthorizes through FY2024 the HRSA Geriatrics Workforce Enhancement Program and the Geriatrics Academic Career Award Program. Grants under these programs may be used to (1) support clinical training and integrate health care services for older adults and (2) promote the career development of eligible faculty specializing in geriatric health. HRSA must prioritize the funding of training and services in rural and underserved areas.Further, the bill reauthorizes the pediatric specialty loan repayment program. The program provides qualified pediatric medical specialists or child and adolescent mental, behavioral, and psychiatric health specialists up to three years of loan repayment in exchange for two years of service providing health care in an area with limited access to such care. Finally, the bill establishes grants for education programs to provide scholarships or stipends to students from underrepresented groups who are enrolled in programs for physical or occupational therapy, audiology, or speech-language pathology.
Title
EMPOWER for Health Act of 2019 Educating Medical Professionals and Optimizing Workforce Efficiency and Readiness for Health Act of 2019
Sponsors
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Billy Long [R-MO] |
Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Sean Casten [D-IL] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL] | Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX] | Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY] | Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2019-10-28 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2019-10-28 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8509-8511) |
2019-10-28 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 2781. |
2019-10-28 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8509-8513) |
2019-10-28 | House | Ms. Schakowsky moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2019-09-24 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 169. |
2019-09-24 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 116-214. |
2019-07-17 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2019-07-17 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-07-11 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2019-07-11 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2019-05-17 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2019-05-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2019-05-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB3637 (Related) 2019-07-10 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
SB2443 (Related) 2019-09-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5364)
SB2443 (Related) 2019-09-09 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5364)
Subjects
Aging
Child health
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Education programs funding
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Minority education
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Student aid and college costs
Child health
Congressional oversight
Dental care
Education programs funding
Health
Health care coverage and access
Health care quality
Health personnel
Health programs administration and funding
Medical education
Mental health
Minority education
Minority health
Neurological disorders
Student aid and college costs