US HB2774 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-06-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Hack DHS Act Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017 This bill directs the Department of Homeland Security (DHS) to establish a bug bounty pilot program to minimize vulnerabilities to DHS information systems. "Bug bounty program" is a program under which an approved computer security specialist or security researcher is temporarily authorized to identify and report vulnerabilities within DHS information systems in exchange for cash payment. Under such program, DHS shall: provide monetary compensation for reports of previously unidentified security vulnerabilities within the websites, applications, and other DHS information systems that are accessible to the public; develop an expeditious process by which computer security researchers can register for the program, submit to a background check, and receive a determination as to approval for program participation; designate mission-critical operations within DHS that should be excluded; consult with the Department of Justice on how to ensure that program participants are protected from prosecution for activities authorized under the program; award competitive contracts to manage the program and for executing the remediation of identified vulnerabilities; and engage interested persons, including commercial sector representatives, about the structure of the program.
Title
Hack DHS Act Hack the Department of Homeland Security Act of 2017
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] | Rep. Scott Taylor [R-VA] | Rep. Patrick Meehan [R-PA] | Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA] | Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL] | Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Cybersecurity and Infrastructure Protection. |
2017-06-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Homeland Security. |
2017-06-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1281 (Related) 2018-09-25 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 752.
HB3868 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
HB3868 (Related) 2017-09-28 - Referred to the Committee on Financial Services, and in addition to the Committee on Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
Subjects
Computer security and identity theft
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
Criminal investigation, prosecution, interrogation
Department of Homeland Security
Government information and archives
Government operations and politics
Public contracts and procurement
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/2774/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr2774/BILLS-115hr2774ih.pdf |