US HB276 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 44-14)
Status: Passed on April 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-13.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Recognizing Achievement in Classified School Employees Act

Sponsors

Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA]Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Julia Brownley [D-CA]Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA]Rep. John Garamendi [D-CA]Rep. Glenn Thompson [R-PA]
Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL]Rep. Adam Schiff [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]
Rep. Mark DeSaulnier [D-CA]Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY]Rep. Eric Swalwell [D-CA]Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV]
Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA]Rep. Scott Peters [D-CA]Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME]Rep. Norma Torres [D-CA]
Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA]
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]Rep. Cathy McMorris Rodgers [R-WA]Rep. Rodney Davis [R-IL]Rep. Derek Kilmer [D-WA]
Rep. Denny Heck [D-WA]Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ]Rep. David Joyce [R-OH]Rep. Danny Davis [D-IL]
Rep. Dwight Evans [D-PA]Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ]Rep. James Langevin [D-RI]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]
Rep. James Comer [R-KY]Rep. David McKinley [R-WV]Rep. Val Demings [D-FL]Rep. David Trone [D-MD]
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN]Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL]Rep. Greg Walden [R-OR]Rep. Trent Kelly [R-MS]
Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]Rep. Lori Trahan [D-MA]Rep. Peter Welch [D-VT]Rep. Ben Lujan [D-NM]
Rep. Michael Simpson [R-ID]Rep. Don Bacon [R-NE]Rep. Suzan DelBene [D-WA]Rep. Steven Horsford [D-NV]
Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Nicholas Taylor [R-TX]

Roll Calls

2019-02-25 - House - On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill RC# 89 (Y: 387 N: 19 NV: 25 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-12SenateBecame Public Law No: 116-13.
2019-04-12SenateSigned by President.
2019-04-04SenatePresented to President.
2019-04-01SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
2019-03-28SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
2019-03-28SenateSenate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2098)
2019-02-26SenateReceived in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
2019-02-25HouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
2019-02-25HouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 387 - 19 (Roll no. 89). (text: CR H2060-2061)
2019-02-25HouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H2067)
2019-02-25HouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
2019-02-25HouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 276.
2019-02-25HouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2060-2062)
2019-02-25HouseMrs. Lee (NV) moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill.
2019-01-08HouseReferred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
2019-01-08HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

SB323 (Related) 2019-02-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback